IL HB4474 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children with Disabilities Article of the School Code. Provides that in the development of the individualized education program for a student who is 17 years of age or older, or will be during that school year, the IEP team shall consider voter registration as an appropriate goal or competency to be included in the IEP, and, if appropriate, when and how voter registration shall be accomplished. Provides that any resulting decisions shall be included in the IEP. Effective July 1, 2024.
Title
SCH CD-IEP-VOTER REGISTRATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-14 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2024-01-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-17 | House | First Reading |
2024-01-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Nabeela Syed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 14-8.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4474&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB4474.htm |