IL HB4491 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Child Care Act of 1969. Provides that either a qualified child care director or a qualified early childhood teacher with a minimum of 2,880 hours of experience as an early childhood teacher, must be present for the first and last hour of the workday and at the open or close of the facility.
Title
CHILD CARE FACILITY-STANDARDS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2024-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2024-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass |
2024-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock |
2024-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2024-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson |
2024-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting |
2024-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2024-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed |
2024-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2024-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2024-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton |
2024-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty |
2024-03-14 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee; 014-000-000 |
2024-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee; by Voice Vote |
2024-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee |
2024-03-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee |
2024-01-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-17 | House | First Reading |
2024-01-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 10 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |