IL HB4510 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 24, 2024
Pending: House Medicaid & Managed Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 24, 2024
Pending: House Medicaid & Managed Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that beginning January 1, 2025, renal dialysis services provided within a skilled nursing facility by a certified home dialysis provider shall receive a per-claim add-on payment of $95 per treatment. Defines "certified home dialysis provider" to mean an end stage renal disease facility that (i) provides dialysis treatment or dialysis training to caregivers or individuals with end stage renal disease and (ii) has been approved to provide dialysis home training support services by the federal Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services. Effective January 1, 2025.
Title
DHFS-RENAL DIALYSIS PAYMENTS
Sponsors
Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 24, 2024 |
2024-04-04 | House | To Medicaid & Managed Care Subcommittee |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2024-01-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4510&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB4510.htm |