IL HB4592 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Identification Card Act and the Illinois Vehicle Code. Allows the Secretary of State to issue a mobile Illinois Identification Card or mobile driver's license to an individual who is otherwise eligible to hold a physical credential, in addition to an identification card or driver's license, if the Secretary of State has issued an identification card or driver's license to the person. Allows the Secretary to enter into agreements or to contract with an agency of the State, another state, the United States, or a third party to facilitate the issuance, use, and verification of a mobile identification card or driver's license issued by the Secretary or another state. Requires the data elements that are used to build an electronic credential to match the individual's current Department record. Requires all mobile identification cards and driver's licenses issued by the Secretary to be in accordance with the most recent standards of the American Association of Motor Vehicle Administrators. Provides that, when required by law and upon request by law enforcement, a credential holder must provide the credential holder's physical credential. Provides that the display of a mobile identification card and driver's license shall not serve as consent or authorization for a law enforcement officer, or any other person, to search, view, or access any other data or application on the mobile device.
Title
VEH CD-MOBILE ID CARDS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed to Table Rep. Kam Buckner |
2024-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 011-000-000 |
2024-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety |
2024-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety |
2024-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kam Buckner |
2024-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kam Buckner |
2024-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 011-000-000 |
2024-03-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety |
2024-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2024-01-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kam Buckner |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 335 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |