IL HB4682 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Governmental Ethics Act. Provides that no local elected official may engage in lobbying if he or she accepts compensation specifically attributable to such lobbying, other than that provided by law or ordinance for local elected officials. Provides that nothing prohibits a local elected official from lobbying without compensation. Defines terms. Effective immediately.
Title
ETHICS-LOCAL OFFICIAL LOBBYING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 420 | 1-109 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 420 | 1-110.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 1-110.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 2-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4682&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4682.htm |