IL HB4704 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Marriage and Dissolution of Marriage Act. Requires proof that each party to the marriage has attained the age of 18 years in order to obtain a license to marry and a marriage certificate from the county clerk. Deletes language allowing proof that each party to the marriage will have attained the age of 18 years at the time the marriage license is effective or will have attained the age of 16 years and has either the consent to the marriage of both parents or his guardian or judicial approval. Makes corresponding changes. Repeals a provision regarding judicial approval of underage marriages. Effective immediately, except that specified provisions take effect 2 years after the Act becomes law.
Title
IMDMA-NO MARRIAGE UNDER AGE 18
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Sosnowski [R] | Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] | Rep. Chris Bos [R] | Rep. Tony McCombie [R] |
Rep. Barbara Hernandez [D] | Sen. Andrew Chesney [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-07 | House | To Family Law & Probate Subcommittee |
2022-02-01 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2022-01-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2022-01-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2022-01-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2022-01-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
750 | 5 | 203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 5 | 208 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
750 | 5 | 301 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 5 | 302 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4704&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB4704.htm |