IL HB4758 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children and Family Services Act. In provisions requiring the Department of Children and Family Services to submit annual reports to the General Assembly regarding youth in care waiting for placement or psychiatric hospitalization, expands the information required in the reports to include the number of youth in care who remained overnight in temporary living spaces not authorized under the Child Care Act of 1969 solely because the Department cannot locate an appropriate placement for the youth. Provides that temporary living spaces not authorized under the Child Care Act of 1969 include, but are not limited to, Department or private agency offices or welcome centers. Defines "remaining overnight" to mean being present in the temporary living space at 1:00 a.m. Provides that at a minimum, the report shall include the following information regarding each youth: age, region, date of stay, length of time the youth was in the temporary living space, date and time the youth was moved from the temporary living space, the reason for the youth remaining overnight, and the type of placement or setting the youth was in immediately after leaving the temporary living space. Requires the report to reflect the number of unique youth involved, the number of episodes that occurred fitting the criteria, and the number of unique youth involved in multiple episodes. Effective immediately.
Title
DCFS RPTS-OVERNIGHT STAYS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Lakesia Collins |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2024-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2024-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 013-000-000 |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 505 | 2.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |