IL HB4848 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Bennett
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Bennett
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that no person shall operate or cause to be operated, on a highway, a commercial motor vehicle, with the exception of a highway maintenance vehicle, transporting garbage or refuse unless the tailgate on the vehicle is in good working repair, good operating condition, and closes securely, with a cover or tarpaulin of sufficient size attached so as to prevent any load, residue, or other material from escaping. Provides that a violation of the provisions shall be a petty offense punishable by a fine not to exceed $150 (rather than $250). Provides that a person, firm, or corporation convicted of 4 or more violations within a 12-month period shall be fined an additional amount of $150 for the fourth and each subsequent conviction within the 12-month period. Amends the Criminal and Traffic Assessment Act. In provisions concerning conditional assessments, provides for distribution of a conditional assessment for a violation of the provisions.
Title
VEH CD-LOAD COVERS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Bennett |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Erica Harriss |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson |
2024-04-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000 |
2024-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 009-000-000 |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety |
2024-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2024-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2024-04-03 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-03 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 011-000-000 |
2024-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting |
2024-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2024-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2024-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2024-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety |
2024-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts |
2024-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2024-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2024-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2024-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski |
2024-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2024-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jeff Keicher |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 15-109.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 135 | 15-70 | Amended Code | Citation Text |