IL HB4872 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that a municipality shall receive a waiver from paying a required match to a State grant of State moneys if the municipality meets all the other requirements needed for approval of the grant and submits documentation to the Governor's Office of Management and Budget, in a form and manner prescribed by the Office, that the municipality: (1) has a population under 25,000; (2) has over 13% of its residents under the federal poverty guidelines; (3) has had a negative fund balance within the past 5 years; or (4) has at least twice the debt compared to the retail market value of the municipality's real and personal property and moneys in the municipality's accounts.. Effective July 1, 2025.
Title
MUNI CD-GRANT MATCHING PMTS
Sponsors
Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin [D] | Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] | Rep. Marcus Evans [D] | Rep. Robert Rita [D] |
Rep. Justin Slaughter [D] | Rep. Mary Canty [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee |
2024-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty |
2024-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2024-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita |
2024-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2024-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-02 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 016-000-000 |
2024-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |