IL HB5415 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 24, 2024
Pending: House Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 24, 2024
Pending: House Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. In a provision concerning the child care assistance program, expands the categories of families eligible for assistance to include, beginning January 1, 2025, all child care workers with incomes at or below 325% of the federal poverty level for each family size.
Title
DHS-CCAP-CHILD CARE WORKERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 24, 2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 9A-11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5415&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB5415.htm |