IL HB5528 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1155
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1155
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Create the First Response Broadcasters Act. Defines "broadcaster" and "first response broadcaster". Provides that broadcasters shall, in cooperation with the Illinois Emergency Management Agency and the Illinois Broadcasters Association or its successor organization, develop comprehensive, coordinated plans for preparing for and responding appropriately to an emergency or disaster. Sets forth procedures for training and certification of broadcasters and priorities for distribution and confiscation of equipment, supplies, and facilities. Effective immediately.
Title
FIRST RESPONSE BROADCASTERS
Sponsors
Rep. John Bradley [D] | Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] | Rep. Jerry Costello [D] | Rep. Robert Pritchard [R] |
Sen. Antonio Munoz [D] | Sen. Kirk Dillard [R] | Sen. William McCann [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-01-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-25 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1155 |
2013-01-25 | House | Effective Date January 25, 2013 |
2013-01-25 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-01-08 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-01-03 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000 |
2013-01-02 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As January 8, 2013 |
2013-01-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 3, 2013 |
2013-01-02 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2012-07-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2012-05-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2012 |
2012-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 31, 2012 |
2012-05-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 26, 2012 |
2012-04-25 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 010-000-000 |
2012-04-11 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Mu |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2012 |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2012-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2012-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2012-03-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2012-03-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2012-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2012-03-22 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 006-000-000 |
2012-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2012-03-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John E. Bradley |
2012-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2012-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-07 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 006-000-000 |
2012-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote |
2012-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2012-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John E. Bradley |
2012-02-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2012-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John E. Bradley |
2012-02-27 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2012-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2012-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John E. Bradley |