IL HB5596 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-26 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the School Code's construction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EDUCATION-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-26 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2010-03-25 House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted - Lost Environmental Health Committee; 006-007-000
2010-03-25 Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon
2010-03-25 Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2010-03-25 Second Reading - Short Debate
2010-03-25 House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Environmental Health Committee
2010-03-22 Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Suzanne Bassi
2010-03-22 House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2010-03-22 House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Suzanne Bassi
2010-03-10 Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2010-03-10 Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2010-03-08 Assigned to Executive Committee
2010-02-09 Referred to Rules Committee
2010-02-09 First Reading
2010-02-08 Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon
2010-02-08 Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback