IL HB5596 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Civil Practice Law of the Code of Civil Procedure. Defines "product liability action" and "confidentiality order". Provides that for good cause shown, a party required to respond to discovery in a product liability action may obtain a confidentiality order. Provides that if the court finds that such a confidentiality order is appropriate, the order shall be narrowly drafted and may permit the subsequent designation of specific confidential materials. Provides that, if a party objects to a designation that limits disclosure or dissemination of materials under a confidentiality order, the party seeking to limit disclosure or dissemination pursuant to a claim of confidentiality must demonstrate, by a preponderance of the evidence, a specific, serious, and substantial interest in confidentiality that outweighs the adverse effect of confidentiality upon the general public health or safety. Provides for appeals of orders denying confidentiality. Provides that the new provisions do not: preclude the use of confidentiality orders to protect trade secrets; apply to laws or regulations safeguarding the confidentiality of medical records; or apply to healthcare services. Contains provisions concerning intervention; prohibited agreements; applicability; and other matters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CIV PRO-CONFIDENTIALITY ORDERS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-08HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2016-03-23HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2016-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2016-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2016-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73552-1021New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback