IL HB5654 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Vital Records Act. Removes language requiring that the State Registrar of Vital Records establish a new certificate of birth when he receives a declaration stating that a person has undergone treatment for the purpose of gender transition, or that the individual has an intersex condition, and that the sex designation on such person's birth record should therefore be changed. Provides that the State Registrar of Vital Records must establish a new certificate of birth when he receives a statement signed by the person in which the person attests to making the request for the purpose of affirming the person's gender identity or intersex condition and that the sex designation on the person's certificate of birth should therefore be changed. Provides that the fee for a new certificate of birth shall not be required from persons upon release from the Department of Corrections or the Department of Juvenile Justice, but the person is entitled to only one new certificate of birth fee waiver. Provides that the fee for a new certificate of birth shall be waived for homeless persons, youths in care, and persons under the age of 27 who were youths in care. Effective January 1, 2021.
Title
BIRTH CERTIFICATE CHANGE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2020-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-03-04 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 010-003-000 |
2020-03-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2020-03-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2020-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 535 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 535 | 25.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 535 | 25.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |