IL HB5764 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0925
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0925
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Hospital Licensing Act. Provides that hospitals shall have policies and procedures for readily gaining access to a locked bathroom in a patient's room.
Title
HOSP PATIENT BATHROOM DOOR LOC
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-14 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0925 | |
2010-06-14 | Effective Date January 1, 2011 | |
2010-06-14 | Governor Approved | |
2010-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-29 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-04-29 | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 | |
2010-04-29 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter | |
2010-04-22 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2010 | |
2010-04-21 | Second Reading | |
2010-04-21 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado | |
2010-04-20 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 21, 2010 | |
2010-04-20 | Do Pass Public Health; 007-000-000 | |
2010-04-20 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz | |
2010-04-14 | Postponed - Public Health | |
2010-04-06 | Assigned to Public Health | |
2010-03-23 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-23 | First Reading | |
2010-03-18 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Gary Forby | |
2010-03-18 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 23, 2010 | |
2010-03-18 | Arrive in Senate | |
2010-03-18 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 | |
2010-03-18 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-11 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-02-24 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-02-24 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 007-000-000 | |
2010-02-24 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2010-02-24 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Human Services Committee | |
2010-02-17 | Assigned to Human Services Committee | |
2010-02-09 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-09 | First Reading | |
2010-02-09 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John E. Bradley |