IL HB5873 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-08 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-08 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Redistricting Transparency and Public Participation Act. Creates the Independent Redistricting Commission to adopt and file with the Secretary of State a redistricting plan for Legislative and Representative Districts (rather than requiring the Senate and House of Representatives to each establish a committee, or the Senate and House of Representatives may create by joint resolution a joint committee of both chambers, to consider proposals to redistrict the Legislative Districts or Representative Districts). Provides the commissioner selection process and meeting and voting requirements to adopt a plan. Makes conforming changes in the Act. Effective immediately.
Title
REDISTRICTING-COMMISSION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-08 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2021-01-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2021-01-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2021-01-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2021-01-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2021-01-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-01-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2021-01-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2021-01-07 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2021-01-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2021-01-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2021-01-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2021-01-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 125 | 10-10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 125 | 10-5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5873&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5873.htm |