IL HJR0007 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the Auditor General to conduct a performance audit of the Illinois State Police Division of Forensic Services.
Title
ISP-FORENSIC SERVICES-AUDIT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Motion in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Motion in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 057-000-000 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Be Adopted State Government; 007-000-000 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-04-02 | House | Resolution Adopted 107-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2019-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2019-03-13 | House | Recommends Be Adopted as Amended State Government Administration Committee; 011-000-000 |
2019-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-03-05 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2019-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney |
2019-02-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2019-01-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-01-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2019-01-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-01-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney |