IL HJR0059 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
RESOLVED, BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE ONE HUNDRED THIRD GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, THE SENATE CONCURRING HEREIN, that when the two Houses adjourn on Thursday, February 22, 2024, the House of Representatives stands adjourned until Tuesday, March 5, 2024, or to the call of the Speaker; and the Senate stands adjourned until Tuesday, March 5, 2024, or to the call of the President.
Title
ADJOURN HOUSE & SENATE
Sponsors
Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] | Sen. Omar Aquino [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Prevailed to Suspend Rule 3-6(a) |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Moved to Suspend Rule Sen. Omar Aquino; 3-6(a) |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-02-21 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2024-02-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=59&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HJR/10300HJ0059.htm |