IL HJR0075 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-28 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-28 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the section of Illinois Route 251 from Bridge Street in Roscoe to Rockton Road in Roscoe as the "Specialist Brandon Jacob Rowe Memorial Highway".
Title
SPC BRANDON ROWE MEM HGHWY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-05-30 | House | Resolution Adopted 117-000-000 |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2019-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-05-24 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-05-23 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2019-05-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=75&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HJR/10100HJ0075.htm |