IL HR0369 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Chicago's public schools to continue to engage students in the local school council process.
Title
CPS-LOCAL SCHOOL COUNCIL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2015-04-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2015-04-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2015-04-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2015-04-29 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 026-000-000 |
2015-04-20 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2015-04-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=369&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HR/09900HR0369.htm |