IL HR0696 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 012-000-000
Hearing: May 1 @ 3:00 pm in Room 122B
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 012-000-000
Hearing: May 1 @ 3:00 pm in Room 122B
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes the 2024 Alpha Phi Alpha Day held at the Illinois State Capitol and welcomes the members of Alpha Phi Alpha to the Capitol. Declares May 1, 2024 as Alpha Phi Alpha Day.
Title
ALPHA PHI ALPHA DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 012-000-000 |
2024-05-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
2024-04-12 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=696&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HR/10300HR0696.htm |