IL SB0015 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0584
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0584
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Chicago Board of Education District Act. Divides the City of Chicago into 10 districts and 20 subdistricts for the purpose of identifying persons who will serve on the Chicago Board of Education. Amends the School Code. Provides that, by December 14, 2024, the Mayor of the City of Chicago shall appoint a President of the Chicago Board of Education who shall serve a 2-year term. Provides that, until January 15, 2027, each district shall be represented by one member elected at the 2024 general election to a 2-year term and one member appointed by the Mayor to a 2-year term. Requires each of the elected members to reside within the district that the member represents. Requires each of the appointed members to reside both within the district that the member represents and outside of the subdistrict within which the elected member of the district resides. Provides that, beginning January 15, 2027, each subdistrict shall be represented by one member who is elected at the 2026 general election. Specifies that, if a member is elected at the 2026 general election to fill the expired term of an appointed member, then the elected member shall serve a 2-year term. Specifies that, if a member is elected at the 2026 general election to fill the expired term of an elected member, then the member shall serve a 4-year term. Requires each of the members elected in 2026 to reside within the subdistrict that the member represents. Provides that, if a member is elected at the 2026 general election to serve a 2-year term, then the member elected at the 2028 general election shall serve a 4-year term, and, if a member is elected at the 2026 general election to serve a 4-year term, then the member elected in that subdistrict at the 2030 general election shall serve a 2-year term. Provides that, beginning with the members elected at the 2032 general election, the members of each district shall serve two 4-year terms and one 2-year term for each 10-year period thereafter as determined by lot. Makes other changes concerning: conflicts of interests of board members, eligibility of individuals to serve as board members, nominating petitions for board members, the creation of the Chicago Board of Education Black Student Achievement Committee and other advisory bodies, and the creation and redistricting of subdistricts. Effective immediately.
Title
EDUCATION-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 75 N: 31 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0584 |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Effective Date March 18, 2024 |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2024-03-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid |
2024-03-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2024-03-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2024-03-07 | House | Motion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2024-03-07 | House | Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2024-03-07 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 075-031-003 |
2024-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-06 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-003-000 |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2024-03-06 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed by Voice Vote |
2024-03-06 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2024-03-05 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2024-03-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-05 | House | First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
2024-03-05 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 037-020-000 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harmon |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 009-004-000 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 5, 2024 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000 |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-01-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 1-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |