IL SB0018 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Requires the State Board of Elections to provide a single, consolidated report to the Governor and General Assembly that includes a detailed analysis and accounting from all divisions of the Board of all activities from the preceding 12 months, the current state of each division, and a detailed statement of goals and expectations for the coming year. Provides that the Board's report shall contain the methodology used in gathering and analyzing the data. Provides that the Executive Director of the State Board of Elections shall certify that the data included in the Board's report is accurate and reliable. Provides that the Board shall publish its report on its website. Requires the General Assembly to request the Executive Director and all division heads to provide an in-person briefing to a committee of each chamber of the General Assembly concerning the information provided in the report. Expressly provides that the Board has the authority to enter into bilateral voter data sharing agreements with bordering states and multi-state voter data sharing agreements. Provides the governance, security, and data accuracy requirements for multi-state voter data sharing programs and bilateral voter data sharing agreements the Board enters into agreements with. Authorizes the Board to adopt rules to execute voter data sharing agreements. Effective immediately.
Title
ELECTION CD-ELECTRONIC REGISTR
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 013-005-000 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 1A-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 805 | 8.43 | New Code | See Bill Text |