IL SB0033 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that political committee funds may be used for certain child care expenses that are necessary for the fulfillment of political, governmental, or public policy duties, activities, or purposes. Effective immediately.
Title
ELEC CD-CHILD CARE EXPENSES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2020-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2020-02-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 046-000-001 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 25, 2020 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 20, 2020 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 018-000-000 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Re-assigned to Executive |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Election Law |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 9-8.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |