IL SB0069 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Chicago Teacher Article of the Illinois Pension Code. With regard to the compensation limitations in the case of a service retirement pensioner who is re-employed as a teacher, provides that (1) the 100-day limit shall not include days that a teacher teaches only driver education courses after regular school hours and does not teach any other subject area and (2) the $30,000 limit shall not include compensation earned for teaching driver education courses after regular school hours. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-CHI TCHR-RETURN TO WORK
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Re-assigned to Executive |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-01-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 17-149 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=69&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB0069.htm |