IL SB0085 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Local Government Inspector General Act. Provides that the purpose of the Act is to establish an independent entity to which allegations of incompetence, neglect of duty, malfeasance in office, corruption, or official misconduct involving units of local government, including their officers, employees, and agents, or elected or appointed local officials, may be reported and investigated with the assistance of the Attorney General. Creates the Local Government Ethics Commission and the Office of the Local Government Inspector General and provides that members of the Commission and the Inspector General shall be appointed by the Governor with the advice and consent of the Senate. Sets forth the procedures of investigating a complaint and the issuing of reports. Defines terms.
Title
LOCAL GOVT INSPECTOR GENERAL
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Brady [R] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Re-referred to Government Reform |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Do Pass Government Reform; 006-000-000 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Postponed - Government Reform |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Government Reform |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - Government Reform |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Government Reform |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=85&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0085.htm |