IL SB0112 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-15 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-15 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Uniform Disposition of Unclaimed Property Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning definitions.
Title
CIVIL LAW-TECH
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-15 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-18 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 19, 2009 | |
2009-03-18 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000 | |
2009-03-05 | Assigned to Executive | |
2009-01-30 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-01-30 | First Reading | |
2009-01-30 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=112&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB0112.htm |