IL SB0145 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0735
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0735
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Physician Assistant Practice Act of 1987. Provides that the collaborating physician shall file with the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation notice of employment, discharge, or collaboration with a physician assistant within 60 days (rather than at the time) of employment, discharge, or assumption of collaboration with a physician assistant. Provides that nothing in the amendatory Act shall prevent a physician assistant from beginning his or her employment before the notice of employment or collaboration has been filed.
Title
PHYSICIAN ASSISTANTS-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0735 |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000 |
2022-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-01-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 008-000-000 |
2022-01-19 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2022-01-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2022-01-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2022-01-07 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2022-01-05 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2021-12-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2021-11-19 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2021-10-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-10-27 | House | First Reading |
2021-10-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2021-10-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading October 26, 2021 |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities; 006-000-000 |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As December 1, 2021 |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Re-assigned to Licensed Activities |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2021 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 23, 2021 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 60 | 54.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 95 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 95 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 95 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 95 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 95 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 95 | 7.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 95 | 7.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |