IL SB0155 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0493
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0493
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning evidence.
Title
UNCLAIMED PROP-SAVINGS BONDS
Sponsors
Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. Napoleon Harris [D] | Rep. Arthur Turner [D] |
Rep. Louis Lang [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-12-07 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-07 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 79 N: 32 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-07 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 79 N: 32 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0493 |
2015-12-17 | Senate | Effective Date December 17, 2015 |
2015-12-17 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2015-12-15 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-12-07 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2015-12-07 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 050-001-000 |
2015-12-07 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 050-001-000 |
2015-12-07 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2015-12-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2015-12-07 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2015-12-07 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2015-12-07 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2015-12-07 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2015-12-07 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2015-12-07 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2015-12-07 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2015-12-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - December 7, 2015 |
2015-12-04 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2015-11-10 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 079-032-001 |
2015-11-10 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2015-11-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-11-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2015-11-10 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-11-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000 |
2015-11-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. André Thapedi |
2015-11-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. André Thapedi |
2015-11-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2015-11-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-11-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |
2015-10-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) December 4, 2015 |
2015-10-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-10-20 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-10-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-10-20 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 009-000-000 |
2015-10-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote |
2015-10-20 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2015-10-20 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Arthur Turner |
2015-10-20 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Arthur Turner |
2015-10-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2015-10-19 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2015-10-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-10-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |
2015-10-14 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) October 31, 2015 |
2015-10-14 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2015-05-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-14 | House | First Reading |
2015-05-14 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2015-05-14 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2015 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Haine |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Financial Institutions; 011-000-000 |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Financial Institutions |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Financial Institutions |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2015 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Financial Institutions |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William R. Haine |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-01-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 8-2401 | Amended Code | Citation Text |