IL SB0161 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-4)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0527
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-4)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0527
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with additions and changes. Modifies provisions concerning the Worker Protection Unit. Specifies that the Unit shall be dedicated to combating businesses that underpay their employees, force their employees to work in unsafe conditions, and gain an unfair economic advantage by avoiding their tax and labor responsibilities. Specifies that the Unit shall have the power and duty to intervene in, initiate, and enforce all legal proceedings on matters related to the payment of wages, the safety of the workplace, and fair employment practices. Provides that the Office of the Attorney General may use information obtained by the Worker Protection Unit for law enforcement purposes only. Modifies provisions concerning the Worker Protection Unit Task Force. Provides that the Task Force shall be coordinated by the Office of the Attorney General to promote a statewide outreach and enforcement effort to target businesses that violate the State's worker protection laws (currently, to target Illinois' underground economy). Adds members to the Task Force. Makes other changes concerning the purposes and duties of the Unit and Task Force.
Title
ATTY GEN-WORKER PROTECT UNIT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0527 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-016-000 |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-05-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 021-003-000 |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-04-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2019-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-04-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2019 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Curran |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 205 | 6.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 205 | 6.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |