IL SB0193 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that all proceedings under the Act in respect to any minor automatically terminate upon his or her attaining the age of 21 years (rather than 19 years). Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JUV CT-DURATION OF WARDSHIP

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2019-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-001
2019-05-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Judiciary; 009-000-000
2019-05-22SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Judiciary
2019-05-21SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-05-21SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-05-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 22, 2019
2019-05-21SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-05-21HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
2019-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-14HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-09HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-05-09HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas
2019-05-09HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Diane Pappas
2019-05-08SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-05-08SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas
2019-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer
2019-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2019-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-05-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-07HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 013-000-000
2019-05-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 013-000-000
2019-05-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
2019-05-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-04-09HouseAssigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
2019-03-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-03-27HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-03-27HouseArrived in House
2019-03-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2019-03-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2019
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateDo Pass as Amended Judiciary; 008-000-000
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2019-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
2019-03-12SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2019-03-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary
2019-03-05SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2019-03-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary
2019-02-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2019-02-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-02-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
2019-02-20SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2019-02-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-02-06SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2019-01-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-30SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-30SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7054052-31Amended CodeCitation Text
7054052-33Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=193&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0193.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0193eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0193enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0193sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0193sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0193ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB0193_03272019_033000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100SB0193_05212019_017000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB0193ham001_05312019_023000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback