IL SB0202 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Juvenile Court Act. Provides that when a minor of the age of at least 13 years is adjudged delinquent for the offense of: (1) attempted first degree murder; or (2) any offense involving a use or discharge of a firearm upon school grounds or any part of a building or grounds used for school purposes, including any conveyance owned, leased, or contracted by a school to transport students to or from school or a school related activity that results in bodily injury or death to any person (in addition to first degree murder), the court shall declare the minor a ward of the court and order the minor committed to the Department of Juvenile Justice until the minor's 21st birthday, without the possibility of aftercare release, furlough, or non-emergency authorized absence for a period of 5 years from the date the minor was committed to the Department, except that the time that a minor spent in custody for the instant offense before being committed to the Department shall be considered as time credited towards that 5 year period.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JUV CT-COMMITMENT UNTIL 21

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-02-20SenateTo Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance
2019-02-06SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-31SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-31SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7054055-750Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback