IL SB0343 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that the dyslexia handbook developed by the State Board of Education shall include guidelines on the administration of a universal screener and dyslexia screening, the interpretation of data from these screeners, and the resulting appropriate instruction within a multi-tiered system of support framework. Provides that the State Board of Education shall adopt any rules necessary to ensure that a student will be screened for the risk factors of dyslexia using a universal screener. Sets forth guidelines for developing a universal screening. Sets forth which students are required to be screened. Provides that no later than January 1, 2025, the State Board of Education shall employ at least 5 dyslexia specialists or dyslexia therapists with a minimum of 5 years of field experience in screening, identifying, and treating dyslexia and related disorders. Provides that beginning with the 2024-2025 school year, each school district must screen students in grades kindergarten through 2 for the risk factors of dyslexia using a universal screener approved by the State Board of Education. Provides that if a student is determined to be either at risk or at some risk for dyslexia after the universal screener has been administered, the school district must administer a dyslexia screening of the student. Provides that if a student's dyslexia screening indicates that the student has characteristics of dyslexia, the dyslexia intervention services provided to the student must utilize a structured literacy approach as outlined in the State Board of Education's handbook. Makes other changes.
Title
SCH CD-DYSLEXIA
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.85 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 2-3.161 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.82 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=343&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB0343.htm |