IL SB0598 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the MC/DD Act. Provides that a resident who receives personal or medical care under the Act shall be recognized as being as medically fragile as a person residing in a skilled nursing facility.
Title
IDPH-MC/DD INFECTION CONTROL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Health; 012-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Health |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 23, 2021 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Health |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |