IL SB0609 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0216
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0216
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, if an appeal concerning the assessed valuation of property has been pending before the Property Tax Appeal Board for 2 or more years prior to January 1 of the current assessment year and is still pending as of June 1 of the current assessment year, then the assessed valuation of the property shall be the lesser of: (1) the highest equalized assessed valuation for that property for any assessment year at issue before the Property Tax Appeal Board; or (2) the assessed valuation for that property for the current assessment year as calculated under the Code. Provides that the appellant must meet certain other requirements for that alternate valuation. Effective immediately.
Title
PTAB-PENDING MATTERS
Sponsors
Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Sen. Thomas Cullerton [D] | Sen. Melinda Bush [D] | Sen. William Cunningham [D] |
Rep. Elaine Nekritz [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0216 |
2017-08-18 | Senate | Effective Date August 18, 2017 |
2017-08-18 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 010-001-000 |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-18 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-04-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-25 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2017-04-06 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Revenue; 008-000-000 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |