IL SB0661 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Failed on September 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-24 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Failed on September 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-24 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Hepatitis C Screening Act. Provides that every individual born between the years of 1945 and 1965 who receives health services from a hospital as an inpatient or in the emergency department of a hospital or who receives primary care services in an outpatient department of a hospital or who receives health services from a health care practitioner providing primary care shall be offered a hepatitis C-related test, unless the health care practitioner providing the services reasonably believes that certain conditions are present. Effective January 1, 2016.
Title
HEPATITIS C SCREENING ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 67 N: 42 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 33 N: 19 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 33 N: 19 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-24 | Senate | Total Veto Stands |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Placed Calendar Total Veto |
2015-08-21 | Senate | Governor Vetoed |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2015-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 067-042-001 |
2015-05-22 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-21 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2015-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2015-05-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-20 | House | Judicial Note Filed |
2015-05-19 | House | Home Rule Note Filed |
2015-05-19 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed |
2015-05-19 | House | Pension Note Filed |
2015-05-18 | House | State Debt Impact Note Filed |
2015-05-18 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-18 | House | Correctional Note Filed |
2015-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2015-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2015-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2015-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2015-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2015-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2015-05-18 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2015-05-18 | House | Balanced Budget Note Filed |
2015-05-14 | House | Correctional Note Requested by Rep. André Thapedi |
2015-05-14 | House | Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. André Thapedi |
2015-05-14 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. André Thapedi |
2015-05-14 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. André Thapedi |
2015-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2015-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2015-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2015-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2015-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2015-05-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2015-05-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2015-05-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2015-05-08 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 15, 2015 |
2015-05-04 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2015-04-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-24 | House | First Reading |
2015-04-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2015-04-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 033-019-000 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Mulroe |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 006-002-000 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 26, 2015 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Public Health; 006-002-000 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-01-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |