IL SB1124 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Tobacco Products Tax Act of 1995. Provides that, beginning on July 1, 2019, "tobacco products" also includes electronic cigarettes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TOBACCO TAX-E-CIGARETTES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-05-10SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
2019-05-02SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 10, 2019
2019-04-12SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 2, 2019
2019-04-12SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-04-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019
2019-04-09SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateDo Pass Public Health; 012-000-000
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-03-05SenatePostponed - Public Health
2019-02-06SenateAssigned to Public Health
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-05SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-05SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3514310-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback