IL SB1294 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012 concerning identity theft. Changes references in the offense from "personal identification information" to "personal identifying information".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM CD-IDENTIFY THEFT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-21SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-21HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
2019-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-14HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-02HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-30HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 017-000-000
2019-04-24HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-11HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-04-10HouseArrived in House
2019-04-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Glowiak
2019-04-10SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 008-000-000
2019-04-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2019-03-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2019
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000
2019-03-12SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2019-02-20SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2019-02-13SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2019-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720516-30Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback