IL SB1296 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Assessed Clean Energy Act. Makes changes adding residential property to the scope of the Act. Modifies the requirements of a report needed to establish a PACE area and requirements before entering into an assessment contract. For program administrators and contracts that finance residential properties of 4 or fewer units: provides for contractor oversight and training for residential properties inside PACE areas; prohibits specified soliciting, advertising, and direct or indirect cash payments or other things of value to property owners; requires a local unit of government and third-party program administrators to develop a disclosure form for homeowners and a right to cancel within 3 business days assessment contracts; and requires an oral confirmation call to property owners with specified minimum requirements for the call. Effective immediately.
Title
PROPERTY ASSESSED CLEAN ENERGY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Revenue; 007-000-000 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 50 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 50 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 50 | 45 | New Code | See Bill Text |
50 | 50 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 50 | 50 | New Code | See Bill Text |
50 | 50 | 55 | New Code | See Bill Text |