IL SB1346 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-27 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-27 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the South Suburban Airport Authority Act and the South Suburban Airport Authority. Contains provisions concerning governance and finances of the Authority. Provides that the Public Funds Statement Publication Act shall not apply to the Authority. Amends the Archaeological and Paleontological Resources Protection Act, the Human Skeletal Remains Protection Act, the Foreign Trade Zones Act, the Governmental Account Audit Act, the Illinois Municipal Code, the Downstate Forest Preserve District Act, the Vital Records Act, the Religious Freedom Restoration Act, and the Eminent Domain Act to make conforming changes. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement by the State. Effective March 1, 2011.
Title
SOUTH SUBURBAN AIRPORT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-27 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2010-04-23 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2010 | |
2010-03-26 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 15, 2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Second Reading | |
2010-03-19 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As March 26, 2010 | |
2010-02-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 18, 2010 | |
2010-02-17 | Approved for Consideration Assignments | |
2009-08-15 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-30 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2009 | |
2009-04-30 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2009 | |
2009-04-03 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2009 | |
2009-02-27 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 4, 2009 | |
2009-02-27 | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 013-000-000 | |
2009-02-26 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted | |
2009-02-25 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive | |
2009-02-25 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-25 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to Executive | |
2009-02-10 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-10 | First Reading | |
2009-02-10 | Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christine Radogno | |
2009-02-10 | Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson | |
2009-02-10 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1346&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB1346.htm |