IL SB1378 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 22 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Jury Act. Provides that except as otherwise specifically provided by statute, no person who is qualified and able to serve as a juror may be excluded from jury service in any court of this State on the basis of, among other things, sexual orientation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JURIES-UNLAWFUL DISCRIMINATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-22SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-22HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
2019-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-14HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-05-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 014-000-000
2019-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi
2019-05-01HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2019-05-01HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000
2019-04-24HouseTo Civil Procedure Subcommittee
2019-04-09HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2019-03-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2019-03-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2019-03-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2019-03-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2019-03-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-03-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2019-03-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2019-03-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-03-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2019-03-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas
2019-03-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-03-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-03-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-03-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-03-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-03-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-03-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-03-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2019-03-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2019-03-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-03-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-03-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-03-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2019-03-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
2019-03-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-03-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-03-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-03-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2019-03-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-03-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
2019-03-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
2019-03-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-03-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2019-03-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2019-03-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-03-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-03-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-03-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2019-03-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-03-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-03-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2019-03-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2019-03-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-03-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-03-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-03-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-03-14HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2019-03-14HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-03-14HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-03-14HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2019-03-12HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-03-12HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-08HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-03-07HouseArrived in House
2019-03-07SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 7, 2019
2019-03-06SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2019-03-05SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 007-000-000
2019-02-13SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2019-02-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-13SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-13SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7053052Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback