IL SB1624 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0404
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0404
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the contents of the bill, but changes references from vocational education to career and technical education.
Title
HIGHER ED-ADMISSIONS-AG SCI/ED
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-17 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0404 |
2021-08-17 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-17 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-08-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure |
2021-07-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 116-000-000 |
2021-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2021-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2021-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-05-12 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Higher Education Committee; 010-000-000 |
2021-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2021-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2021-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2021-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2021-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2021-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** March 23, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; D. Turner |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Higher Education; 012-000-000 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Doris Turner |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** March 23, 2021 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 014-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Darren Bailey |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Doris Turner |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 305 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 520 | 8e | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 660 | 5-85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 665 | 10-85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 670 | 15-85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 675 | 20-85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 680 | 25-85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 685 | 30-85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 690 | 35-85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |