IL SB1716 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that on or after July 1, 2019, all FDA approved prescription medications that are recognized by a generally accepted standard medical reference as effective in the treatment of conditions specified in the most recent Diagnostic and Statistical Manual of Mental Disorders published by the American Psychiatric Association must be covered under both fee-for-service and managed care medical assistance programs for persons who are otherwise eligible for medical assistance and shall not be subject to any (i) utilization control, (ii) prior authorization mandate, or (iii) lifetime restriction limit mandate.
Title
MEDICAID-PRESCRIPTION MEDS
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Hastings [D] | Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Sen. Toi Hutchinson [D] |
Sen. Robert Peters [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 006-001-000 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Reported Back To Human Services; 002-001-000 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (HS) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1716&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1716.htm |