IL SB1747 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unemployment Insurance Act. In provisions concerning the directory of new hires, provides that the definition of "newly hired employee" includes an individual under an independent contractor arrangement. Effective January 1, 2024.
Title
UNEMPLOYMENT INS-DIRECTORY
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Halpin [D] | Sen. Ram Villivalam [D] | Sen. David Koehler [D] | Sen. Patrick Joyce [D] |
Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel [D] | Sen. Cristina Castro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-09 | Senate | To Labor Subcommittee on Employment Security |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 405 | 1801.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1747&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB1747.htm |