IL SB1808 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0167
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0167
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Provides that in order to intercept and divert youth in care from experiencing homelessness, incarceration, unemployment, and other similar outcomes the Department of Children and Family Services and several specified agencies shall enter into an interagency agreement for the purpose of providing preventive services to youth in care and young adults who are aging-out of or have recently aged out of the custody or guardianship of the Department. Provides that the intergovernmental agreement shall require the Department and the other specified agencies to: (i) establish an interagency liaison to review cases of at-risk youth in care and young adults; and (ii) connect such youth in care and young adults to the appropriate supportive services and treatment programs to stabilize them during their transition out of State care. Requires the Department and the other specified agencies to determine how best to provide housing, education, and employment services to at-risk youth in care and young adults. Requires the Department and other agencies to submit annual reports to the General Assembly on: (1) the number of youth in care and young adults who were intercepted during the reporting period and the supportive services and treatment programs they were connected with; and (2) the duration of the services such youth received in order to stabilize them during their transition out of State care. Requires the Department to submit annual reports to the General Assembly on: (a) the number of youth in care and young adults who are aging out or have aged out of State care during the reporting period; and (b) the length and type of services that were offered to such and the youth's status. Effective immediately.
Title
DCFS-TRANSITIONING YOUTH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-26 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0167 |
2019-07-26 | Senate | Effective Date July 26, 2019 |
2019-07-26 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-05-09 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-05-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2019-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-21 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-03-20 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 008-000-002 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters |