IL SB1835 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0051
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0051
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Provides that alcoholic liquors may be delivered to and sold at Veterans Memorial Hall, located at 211 North Main Street, Rockford in Winnebago County. Effective immediately.
Title
LIQUOR - MEMORIAL HALL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 76 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 76 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-28 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0051 |
2011-06-28 | Senate | Effective Date June 28, 2011 |
2011-06-28 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2011-06-16 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 054-001-000 |
2011-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 054-001-000 |
2011-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 015-000-000 |
2011-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 015-000-000 |
2011-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2011-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2011-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John J. Millner |
2011-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John J. Millner |
2011-05-30 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Millner |
2011-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 31, 2011 |
2011-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2011-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 076-038-001 |
2011-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2011-05-27 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2011 |
2011-05-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2011-05-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2011-05-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2011-05-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-25 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2011-05-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2011-05-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2011-05-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2011-05-23 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2011-05-20 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2011 |
2011-05-13 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 20, 2011 |
2011-04-11 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2011-04-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-07 | House | First Reading |
2011-04-07 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Jefferson |
2011-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-04-07 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 16, 2011 |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2011 |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 015-000-000 |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
235 | 5 | 6-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |