IL SB1846 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. In a provision concerning the tiered exceptional care per diem rates for medically complex for the developmentally disabled facilities, provides that on and after January 1, 2024, each tier rate shall be increased 6% over the amount in effect December 31, 2023. Provides that any reimbursement increases applied to the base rate to providers licensed under the ID/DD Community Care Act must also be applied in an equivalent manner to each tier of exceptional care per diem rates for medically complex for the developmentally disabled facilities. Effective immediately.
Title
MEDICAID-MC/DD RATE INCREASES
Sponsors
Sen. Elgie Sims [D] | Sen. Karina Villa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations - Health and Human Services |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-5.4h | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1846&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB1846.htm |