IL SB1851 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Passed on July 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0646
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Passed on July 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0646
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. In provisions concerning Medicaid reimbursement for facilities that serve severely and chronically ill pediatric patients and clinically complex residents, replaces all references to "long-term care facilities for persons under 22 years of age" with "medically complex for the developmentally disabled facilities".
Title
MEDICAID-MC/DD FACILITIES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-27 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0646 |
2018-07-27 | Senate | Effective Date July 27, 2018 |
2018-07-27 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 052-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 052-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 052-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 016-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 016-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 016-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3 - May 30, 2018 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-012-000 |
2018-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 017-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-05-29 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-29 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-05-29 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2018-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-01-30 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-01-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-01-24 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2017-11-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 10, 2017 |
2017-10-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-10-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-10-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-10-24 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-10-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-10-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2017-10-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-10-17 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-09 | House | Assigned to Special Needs Services |
2017-04-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-04-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 006-000-000 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-5.4h | Amended Code | Citation Text |