IL SB2030 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0365
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0365
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Chicago Firefighter Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Specifies that the age stated in a fireman's application for appointment as a member shall be conclusive evidence of his or her age for the purposes of providing all benefits under the Article (rather than for the purposes of the Article). Provides that for any fireman entering service with the City of Chicago Fire Department after January 1, 2020, the actual birthdate as provided in the fireman's birth certificate shall be conclusive evidence of the fireman's age for the purposes of the Article. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-CHI FIRE-BIRTHDATE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0365 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date August 9, 2019 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-002-000 |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-02 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 008-000-001 |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-29 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-03-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Do Pass Government Accountability and Ethics; 009-000-000 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Government Accountability and Ethics |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 6-217 | Amended Code | Citation Text |