IL SB2062 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Illinois Sustainable Investing Act. Provides that any public agency or governmental unit shall develop, publish, and implement sustainable investment policies applicable to the management of all public funds under its control. Provides that the sustainable investment policy may be incorporated in existing investment policies developed, published, and implemented by a public agency or governmental unit. Provides that the sustainable investment policy shall include material, relevant, and decision-useful sustainability factors to be applied by the public agency or governmental unit in evaluating investment decisions. Provides that a public agency shall prudently integrate sustainability factors into its investment decision-making, investment analysis, portfolio construction, due diligence, and investment ownership in order to maximize anticipated financial returns, minimize projected risk, and more effectively execute its fiduciary duty. Specifies sustainability factors, and the ways in which such factors may be analyzed. Amends the Deposit of State Moneys Act, the Public Funds Investment Act, and the Illinois Pension Code to make changes concerning investment policy and the Illinois Sustainable Investing Act. Provides findings and purpose provisions. Defines terms.
Title
SUSTAINABILITY INVESTING ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - State Government |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended State Government; 009-000-000 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 520 | 22.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 235 | 2.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 1-113.17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 1-113.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |